THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:28:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Oklahoma State Uni College of Osteopathi, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 25 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Oklahoma State Uni College of Osteopathi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 25 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALEXANDER POLLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALEXANDER POLLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Oklahoma State Uni College of Osteopathi, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2019
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2013