THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:31:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: Alam, Mohammad Shafiqul (Used Until: 31 Jul 2024)
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Brampton Civic Hospital, WOHS
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre For Integrated
Health and Wellness, WOHS
20 Lynch Street, Brampton, ON
L6W 2Z8
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department
Grace General Hospital, WRHA
300 Booth Drive
Winnipeg, MB, R3J 3M7
Winnipeg Manitoba R3J 3M7
Phone: (204) 837-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

General Information

Former Name: Alam, Mohammad Shafiqul (Used Until: 31 Jul 2024)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Brampton Civic Hospital, WOHS
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre For Integrated
Health and Wellness, WOHS
20 Lynch Street, Brampton, ON
L6W 2Z8
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department
Grace General Hospital, WRHA
300 Booth Drive
Winnipeg, MB, R3J 3M7
Winnipeg Manitoba R3J 3M7
Phone: (204) 837-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAFIQ MOHAMMAD ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAFIQ MOHAMMAD ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dhaka, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2013