THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15358 111 Ave NW
Acumen Health
Edmonton AB T5M 4C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 587-599-5345
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jesse Slade Shantz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15358 111 Ave NW
Acumen Health
Edmonton AB T5M 4C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 587-599-5345
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jesse Slade Shantz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE ALAN SLADE SHANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLADE SHANTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE ALAN SLADE SHANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLADE SHANTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2013