THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013