THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZARI DVIRNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DVIRNIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZARI DVIRNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DVIRNIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013