THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:28:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Star Kids Clinic
110 Copper Creek Drive Unit 200
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-696-0945
Fax: 365-509-2154
Address: 38 Church St
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 7711
Fax: 416-813-4989

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 10 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Star Kids Clinic
110 Copper Creek Drive Unit 200
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-696-0945
Fax: 365-509-2154
Address: 38 Church St
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 7711
Fax: 416-813-4989

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 10 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JI YOUNG JENNIFER LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JI YOUNG JENNIFER LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013