THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kitchener Urology Partners
202 - 148 Manitou Dr
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 954-2370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taehyoung Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kitchener Urology Partners
202 - 148 Manitou Dr
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 954-2370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taehyoung Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAEHYOUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAEHYOUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013