THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:54:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: 613-798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Blanche River Health Englehart
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Bingham Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Matheson

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: 613-798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Blanche River Health Englehart
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Bingham Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Matheson

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE RIVARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE RIVARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013