THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:29:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 161 Bridge Street West
Belleville and Quinte West Community Health Centre
Belleville Ontario K8P 1K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-962-0000
Fax: 613-962-5669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ladouceur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 161 Bridge Street West
Belleville and Quinte West Community Health Centre
Belleville Ontario K8P 1K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-962-0000
Fax: 613-962-5669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ladouceur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA LADOUCEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADOUCEUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA LADOUCEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADOUCEUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013