THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: Chisholm, Susan Patricia (Used Until: 11 Nov 2015)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1580 Merivale Road
Unit 309
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 226-4030
Fax: (613) 225-3891
Address: 309-1580 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 4B5
Phone: 613-226-4030
Fax: 613-225-3891
Address: 700-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Address: 306-267 O'Connor St
Ottawa ON K2P 1V3
Phone: 613-233-6652
Fax: (613) 233-0981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Chisholm, Susan Patricia (Used Until: 11 Nov 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1580 Merivale Road
Unit 309
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 226-4030
Fax: (613) 225-3891
Address: 309-1580 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 4B5
Phone: 613-226-4030
Fax: 613-225-3891
Address: 700-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Address: 306-267 O'Connor St
Ottawa ON K2P 1V3
Phone: 613-233-6652
Fax: (613) 233-0981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN PATRICIA HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN PATRICIA HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013