THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:26:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health System - Brampton Civic Hospita
Palliative Medicine
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054249120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health System - Brampton Civic Hospita
Palliative Medicine
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054249120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MITALI VATSRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VATSRAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MITALI VATSRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VATSRAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013