THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean Ontario K2J 0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 505-9704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Trinacty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean Ontario K2J 0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 505-9704
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Trinacty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL MARY TRINACTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINACTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL MARY TRINACTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINACTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013