THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:52:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-213-7171
Fax: 519-473-2666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SACHIKO TAKAHASHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Takahashi (CPSO#: 100612 )
Business Address: 302-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 0W7
2262137171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-213-7171
Fax: 519-473-2666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SACHIKO TAKAHASHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Takahashi (CPSO#: 100612 )
Business Address: 302-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 0W7
2262137171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIKO TAKAHASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKAHASHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIKO TAKAHASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKAHASHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013