THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 19:10:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013