THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:51:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-10 Rowan Street
Centre of Health Excellence
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 2X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (709) 726-4880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1
Bonavista Peninsula Health Centre
Bonavista NL A0C 1B0
Phone: (709) 468-7881
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1220 Place d'Orleans Drive
Orléans Ontario K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: (613) 841-5393
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Phone: 7096906909
Fax: 7097020707
Address: Lady Dunn Health Centre
17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
Phone: 705-856-2335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-10 Rowan Street
Centre of Health Excellence
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 2X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (709) 726-4880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1
Bonavista Peninsula Health Centre
Bonavista NL A0C 1B0
Phone: (709) 468-7881
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1220 Place d'Orleans Drive
Orléans Ontario K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: (613) 841-5393
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Phone: 7096906909
Fax: 7097020707
Address: Lady Dunn Health Centre
17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
Phone: 705-856-2335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES FURLONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES FURLONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013