THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:19:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Perugia, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Health Sciences
Centre
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Perugia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Health Sciences
Centre
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 28 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAURA MARCUCCI may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAURA MARCUCCI may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Perugia, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2013