THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 16:40:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins Family Health Team
101 Mall Site
Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins Ontario P4N 6K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-3272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Yates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Yates (CPSO#: 100793 )
Business Address: 38 Pine Street North
Suite 208
Timmins Ontario P4N 6K6
(705) 267-3272
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins Family Health Team
101 Mall Site
Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins Ontario P4N 6K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-3272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Yates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Yates (CPSO#: 100793 )
Business Address: 38 Pine Street North
Suite 208
Timmins Ontario P4N 6K6
(705) 267-3272
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM KENNETH YATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM KENNETH YATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YATES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013