THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:55:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
15 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jan 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
15 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jan 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 15 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jan 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 15 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jan 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013