THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:14:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Lily Lake Road
189 Lily Lake Rd
Campbellton New Brunswick E3N 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al Habash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Lily Lake Road
189 Lily Lake Rd
Campbellton New Brunswick E3N 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al Habash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHANAD YOUSEF EZAT AL HABASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HABASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHANAD YOUSEF EZAT AL HABASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HABASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013