THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:03:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013