THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:19:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: Friedlich, Jessica Danielle (Used Until: 11 Nov 2013)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Sutherland Dr
Toronto ON M4G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165973422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Friedlich, Jessica Danielle (Used Until: 11 Nov 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Sutherland Dr
Toronto ON M4G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165973422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA DANIELLE ARMELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMELAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA DANIELLE ARMELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMELAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013