THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:06:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-265-2255
Fax: 416-265-6737

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient records will remain with the clinic address above.
Harbourfront Appletree
4 - 8 York St
Toronto, ON M5J 2Y2
Phone: 416-366-2273
Fax: 416-366-5665
Date Received: 21 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-265-2255
Fax: 416-265-6737

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient records will remain with the clinic address above.
Harbourfront Appletree
4 - 8 York St
Toronto, ON M5J 2Y2
Phone: 416-366-2273
Fax: 416-366-5665
Date Received: 21 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARNIE BARBARA HIRSHHORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSHHORN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARNIE BARBARA HIRSHHORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSHHORN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013