THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8G 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 Saint Francis Memorial Drive
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: 6137563044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Charles Street
Brockville General Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Brockville Ontario K6V 1T3
Phone: 6133455649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Hospitalist Medicine
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hazeldean Medical Clinic
Suite 203
436 Hazeldean Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 1T9
Phone: 613-369-8330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Hospitalist Medicine
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: 6137742420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot St W
Erie Shores HealthCare
Hospitalist Medicine
Windsor ON N8H 3X2
Phone: 5193222501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Poland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8G 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 Saint Francis Memorial Drive
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: 6137563044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Charles Street
Brockville General Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Brockville Ontario K6V 1T3
Phone: 6133455649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Hospitalist Medicine
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hazeldean Medical Clinic
Suite 203
436 Hazeldean Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 1T9
Phone: 613-369-8330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Hospitalist Medicine
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: 6137742420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot St W
Erie Shores HealthCare
Hospitalist Medicine
Windsor ON N8H 3X2
Phone: 5193222501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Poland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARITA LIANERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANERI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARITA LIANERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANERI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013