THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013