THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:40:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte Genreal Hospital
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
Phone: 16132562500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 90 7th Ave
HDH
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: 15193642340
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2671 River Rd
KDH
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 16132580100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1105 Carling Ave
Focus Eye Centre
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Phone: +16137243937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: 16134324851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: GD
21 McGivern St W
Walkerton ON N0G 2V0
Phone: 5198811220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte Genreal Hospital
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
Phone: 16132562500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 90 7th Ave
HDH
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: 15193642340
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2671 River Rd
KDH
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 16132580100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1105 Carling Ave
Focus Eye Centre
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Phone: +16137243937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: 16134324851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: GD
21 McGivern St W
Walkerton ON N0G 2V0
Phone: 5198811220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013