THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:59:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
D-Wing, Room D332
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Extension: 2766
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. CARVALHO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carvalho (CPSO#: 66298 ) Dr. M. Carvalho (CPSO#: 101208 )

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
D-Wing, Room D332
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Extension: 2766
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. CARVALHO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carvalho (CPSO#: 66298 ) Dr. M. Carvalho (CPSO#: 101208 )

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CARVALHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVALHO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CARVALHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVALHO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013