THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:14:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Douglas (CPSO#: 101215 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Douglas (CPSO#: 101215 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART LAWRENCE DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART LAWRENCE DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013