THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:40:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarin and Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarin and Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
12 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 11 Apr 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 12 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 11 Apr 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013