THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:34:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc
PO Box 58045 RPO Dufferin
North York, ON
M6A 3C8

fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 02 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Cutler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc
PO Box 58045 RPO Dufferin
North York, ON
M6A 3C8

fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 02 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Cutler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2013