THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Queen Street East
St. Michael's Hospital
Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Queen Street East
St. Michael's Hospital
Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERGIO AUGUSTO CARMONA GARCIA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CARMONA GARCIA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CARMONA GARCIA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CARMONA GARCIA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CARMONA GARCIA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CARMONA GARCIA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CARMONA GARCIA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERGIO AUGUSTO CARMONA GARCIA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CARMONA GARCIA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CARMONA GARCIA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CARMONA GARCIA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CARMONA GARCIA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CARMONA GARCIA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CARMONA GARCIA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
17 Sep 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 17 Sep 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013