THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:18:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
08 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 07 Sep 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
08 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Urology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
19 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
01 Jul 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 08 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 07 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 08 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 19 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013