THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:32:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana Facultad de Medicina, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana Facultad de Medicina, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana Facultad de Medicina, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013