THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-6 Harvey St
Good Doctors
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (855) 884-6638
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Healthcare Plus
1408 Queen Street West
Toronto On, M6K 1L9
Toronto Ontario M6K1L9
Phone: 416-532-8277
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225 Richmond Street West
#201
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: n/a
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 118 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1G6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-987-0075
Address: Curology Teledermatology
5717 Pacific Center Blvd #200
San Diego California United States 92121
Phone: 8589874626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alia Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-6 Harvey St
Good Doctors
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (855) 884-6638
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Healthcare Plus
1408 Queen Street West
Toronto On, M6K 1L9
Toronto Ontario M6K1L9
Phone: 416-532-8277
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225 Richmond Street West
#201
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: n/a
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 118 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1G6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-987-0075
Address: Curology Teledermatology
5717 Pacific Center Blvd #200
San Diego California United States 92121
Phone: 8589874626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alia Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIA FURAT ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIA FURAT ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013