THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:12:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randa Lynn Berdusco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Feb 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randa Lynn Berdusco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Feb 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2013