THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:20:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 41 CF Health Services Centre
Building 150
PO Box 100, Station Bureau-chef
Richelain, QC J0J 1R0
Date Received: 29 Jun 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 41 CF Health Services Centre
Building 150
PO Box 100, Station Bureau-chef
Richelain, QC J0J 1R0
Date Received: 29 Jun 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
19 Dec 2023 to 14 Jan 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 19 Dec 2023 to 14 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013