THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:08:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
08 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2016 to 07 Aug 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
08 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2015 to 07 Aug 2015
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
08 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2014 to 07 Aug 2014
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
08 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - General Surgery
01 Jul 2013 to 07 Aug 2013
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 08 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Aug 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 08 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Aug 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 08 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Aug 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 08 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Aug 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013