THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:51:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Pediatric Hematology-Oncology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Extension: 2370
Fax: 6137384828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 24 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Pediatric Hematology-Oncology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Extension: 2370
Fax: 6137384828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 24 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE-PIER FORTIN BOUDREAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN BOUDREAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE-PIER FORTIN BOUDREAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN BOUDREAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2013