THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
12 Jul 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 12 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 21, 2021, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Catherine Maurice in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Maurice to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


Dr. Maurice has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 21, 2021, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Catherine Maurice in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Maurice to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


Dr. Maurice has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2021
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 21 Apr 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013