THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:35:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Seville, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
263 McCaul St
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6801
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 20 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Seville, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
263 McCaul St
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6801
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 20 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2022
19 Aug 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 19 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Paula Alcaide Leon may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
Imaging, Division of Neuroradiology, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. Alcaide Leon holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Alcaide Leon no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Alcaide Leon's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Alcaide Leon's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 20, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 19, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Paula Alcaide Leon may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
Imaging, Division of Neuroradiology, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. Alcaide Leon holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Alcaide Leon no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Alcaide Leon's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Alcaide Leon's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 20, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 19, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Seville, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 19 Aug 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 19 Aug 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013