THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:50:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1154 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474904008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 770 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 0A6
Phone: 4378885940
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1154 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474904008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 770 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 0A6
Phone: 4378885940
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD-OOI POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD-OOI POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013