THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:48:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
675 McDermot Ave
ON2047
Winnipeg MB R3E 0V9
Date Received: 28 May 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Seftel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
675 McDermot Ave
ON2047
Winnipeg MB R3E 0V9
Date Received: 28 May 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Seftel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2013