THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:03:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jan 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jan 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - General Internal Medicine
26 Sep 2017 to 19 Oct 2017
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 06 Mar 2017
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
08 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 26 Sep 2017 to 19 Oct 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Mar 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 08 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013