THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:55:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
06 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 06 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2013