THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:40:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Div. of Pediatric Emergency Med
Suite 1200 Room 1218
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7832
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Div. of Pediatric Emergency Med
Suite 1200 Room 1218
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7832
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH SCHONFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHONFELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH SCHONFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHONFELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2013