THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9201 Sunset Boulevard
Suite 401
Los Angeles California 90069
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3106224764
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara M. Guerra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9201 Sunset Boulevard
Suite 401
Los Angeles California 90069
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3106224764
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara M. Guerra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MARIE GUERRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUERRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MARIE GUERRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUERRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013