THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:17:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Chesley Avenue
London Ontario N5Z 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194338424
Fax: 5194335796
Address: 2130 Morningside Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1X 2E5
Phone: 4163210030
Fax: 4162916604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Chesley Avenue
London Ontario N5Z 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194338424
Fax: 5194335796
Address: 2130 Morningside Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1X 2E5
Phone: 4163210030
Fax: 4162916604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2013