THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 2000
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1260 Golf link rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B0A1
Phone: (807) 766-3370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 26 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RAGA SIRROR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Raga Sirror Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1260 Golf link rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B0A1
Phone: (807) 766-3370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 26 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RAGA SIRROR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Raga Sirror Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAGA BADR ELMAARIF SIRROR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRROR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAGA BADR ELMAARIF SIRROR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRROR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Khartoum, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2013