THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sri Ramachandra Med Col\Research Instit, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1450 O'Connor Dr
unit 20
East York ON M4B 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 3E2
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: 6474902370

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
USA - Connecticut
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sri Ramachandra Med Col\Research Instit, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1450 O'Connor Dr
unit 20
East York ON M4B 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1P 3E2
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: 6474902370

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
USA - Connecticut
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Mar 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 31 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sheeja Mathai may practise medicine independetly in Family Medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sheeja Mathai may practise medicine independetly in Family Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sri Ramachandra Med Col\Research Instit, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2013