THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:32:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Apr 2025
20 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 25 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 20 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Ana Elisa Constant Lohmann Palhares may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology,
Division of Medical Oncology, University of Western Ontario, in
which Dr. Constant Lohmann Palhares holds an academic appointment
at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Constant Lohmann Palhares no longer
holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever
comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Constant Lohmann
Palhares' clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Constant Lohmann
Palhares' certificate of registration, following consideration of
the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2019, and expires on June 20,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Constant Lohmann Palhares' academic
appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be
extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Ana Elisa Constant Lohmann Palhares may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology,
Division of Medical Oncology, University of Western Ontario, in
which Dr. Constant Lohmann Palhares holds an academic appointment
at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Constant Lohmann Palhares no longer
holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever
comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Constant Lohmann
Palhares' clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Constant Lohmann
Palhares' certificate of registration, following consideration of
the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2019, and expires on June 20,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Constant Lohmann Palhares' academic
appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be
extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 20 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 20 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2013