THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:25:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Paediatric Emergency Medicine
525 University Ave- 12th floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Paediatric Emergency Medicine
525 University Ave- 12th floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 12 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NATASHA COLLIA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric emergency medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NATASHA COLLIA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Oct 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2013